Global Patent Index - EP 1012923 B1

EP 1012923 B1 2002-11-27 - FLOATING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

FLOATING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

SCHWIMMENDE VERBINDERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR FLOTTANT

Publication

EP 1012923 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922982 A

Priority

  • EP 98922982 A
  • EP 97401371 A
  • EP 98108597 A
  • IB 9800842 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858424A1] A connector assembly has first and second connectors (4, 6) that are floatably mountable with respect to frames (20, 80) of devices to enable absorption of positional tolerances during coupling. One of the connectors (6) has guide projections (58) formed by orthogonal tapered walls (64, 66) received within in a shoulder (68) of the mating connector. The projections (58) reduce the cross-sectional surface area required for guiding the connectors together. The connector (6) is releasable from its support frame (80) once the connectors are fully coupled, by camming of the latch (78) during coupling. Large positional tolerances in the mating direction are thus absorbed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/631 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6315 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858424 A1 19981223; AU 7543998 A 19990104; DE 69809771 D1 20030109; DE 69809771 T2 20030717; EP 1012923 A1 20000628; EP 1012923 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809771 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB