Global patent index - EP 1013026 A2

EP 1013026 A2 2000-06-28 - CRYPTOGRAPHIC CO-PROCESSOR

Title (en)

CRYPTOGRAPHIC CO-PROCESSOR

Title (de)

KRYPTOGRAPHISCHER KOPROZESSOR

Title (fr)

COPROCESSEUR CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 1013026 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98953170 A

Priority

  • US 9819316 W
  • US 5908297 P
  • US 5983997 P
  • US 5984097 P
  • US 5984197 P
  • US 5984297 P
  • US 5984397 P
  • US 5984497 P
  • US 5984597 P
  • US 5984697 P
  • US 5984797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914881A2] A secure communication platform on an integrated circuit is a highly integrated security processor which incorporates a general purpose digital signal processor (DSP), along with a number of high performance cryptographic function elements, as well as a PCI and PCMCIA interface. The secure communications platform is integrated with an off-the-shelf DSP so that a vendor who is interested in digital signal processing could also receive built-in security functions which cooperate with the DSP. The integrated circuit includes a callable library of cryptographic commands and encryption algorithms. An encryption processor is included to perform key and data encryption, as well as a high performance hash processor and a public key accelerator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/38 (2006.01); G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 21/72 (2013.01); G06F 21/74 (2013.01); G06F 21/79 (2013.01); G06F 21/82 (2013.01); H04L 9/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/0485 (2013.01); G06F 9/3879 (2013.01); G06F 9/46 (2013.01); G06F 21/72 (2013.01); G06F 21/74 (2013.01); G06F 21/79 (2013.01); G06F 21/82 (2013.01); H04L 9/0643 (2013.01); H04L 9/0662 (2013.01); H04L 9/088 (2013.01); H04L 9/0894 (2013.01); H04L 9/3213 (2013.01); H04L 9/3247 (2013.01); H04L 63/16 (2013.01); H04L 2209/04 (2013.01); H04L 2209/125 (2013.01); H04L 2209/20 (2013.01); H04L 2209/34 (2013.01); H04L 2209/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914881 A2 19990325; WO 9914881 A3 19990722; AU 1060999 A 19990405; CA 2303297 A1 19990325; CA 2303297 C 20081125; CA 2634812 A1 19990325; CA 2634812 C 20100330; CA 2641215 A1 19990325; CA 2641215 C 20100525; EP 1013026 A2 20000628; EP 1013026 A4 20040908

INPADOC legal status

2015-09-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20150401

2008-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAFENET, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 9/00 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE