Global patent index - EP 1013097 A1

EP 1013097 A1 2000-06-28 - SEAMLESS SPLICING OF COMPRESSED VIDEO PROGRAMS

Title (en)

SEAMLESS SPLICING OF COMPRESSED VIDEO PROGRAMS

Title (de)

NAHTLOSE VERBINDUNG VON KOMPRIMIERTEN VIDEOPROGRAMMEN

Title (fr)

COLLAGE SANS SOLUTION DE CONTINUITE DE PROGRAMMES VIDEO COMPRIMES

Publication

EP 1013097 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943427 A

Priority

  • US 9817757 W
  • US 92841497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914955A1] A system for seamless splicing of compressed video programming. Various parameters in the splice data are adjusted for proper handling in accordance with the splice. Permissible splice points in both a current and a next program are determined which are most consistent with a desired splice time in order to seamlessly effect the transition from the current to the next program.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/23608 (2013.01); H04N 7/24 (2013.01); H04N 21/23424 (2013.01); H04N 21/8455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914955A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914955 A1 19990325; AU 9122998 A 19990405; CA 2303149 A1 19990325; CA 2303149 C 20031021; EP 1013097 A1 20000628; JP 2001517040 A 20011002

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRAUSE, EDWARD, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MONTA, PETER, A., TERAYON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

2002-03-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011219

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRAUSE, EDWARD, A.

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MONTA, PETER, A., TERAYON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRAUSE, EDWARD, A.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MONTA, PETER, A., TERAYON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE