Global Patent Index - EP 1013140 A1

EP 1013140 A1 2000-06-28 - 5-2-5 MATRIX DECODER SYSTEM

Title (en)

5-2-5 MATRIX DECODER SYSTEM

Title (de)

5-2-5 MATRIX DEKODIERUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DECODAGE A MATRICE 5-2-5

Publication

EP 1013140 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945881 A

Priority

  • US 9818390 W
  • US 5816997 P
  • US 14644298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912386A1] A sound reproduction system for converting stereo signals on two input channels (92, 94), at least one signal component being directionally encoded and correlated and at least one signal component that is not directionally encoded and uncorrelated in the two input channels, into signals for several ouput channels, including decoding apparatus (90) for enhancing the correlated component of the input signals in the desired direction and reducing the strength of such signals in channels not associated with the encoded direction, while preserving the separation between the respective left and right ouput channels (172, 176) and the total energy of the uncorrelated component of the input channels in each output channel, such that instruments recorded on the right input channel stay on the right side of the output channels and the instruments recorded on the left stay on the left side, and the apparent loudness of all the intruments in all the output channels stays the same regardless of the direction of the directionally encoded component of the input signals, and encoding means to encode five input channels so they will encode with correct direction and level in decoders according to the invention, and in decoders according to the current film standard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/02 (2006.01); H04S 3/02 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912386 A1 19990311; WO 9912386 A9 20041021; AU 750877 B2 20020801; AU 750877 C 20040429; AU 9302698 A 19990322; CN 1214690 C 20050810; CN 1278996 A 20010103; EP 1013140 A1 20000628; EP 1013140 A4 20030507; EP 1013140 B1 20121205; JP 2004507904 A 20040311; JP 2006238498 A 20060907; JP 4782614 B2 20110928; PL 338988 A1 20001204

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842907

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121205

2013-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121205

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121205

2013-01-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842907

- Effective date: 20130131

2012-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2012-12-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04S 3/02 20060101AFI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 5-2-5 MATRIX DECODER SYSTEM

2012-03-01 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69842907

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04R0005000000

- IPC: H04S0003020000

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INC.

2003-05-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 5/00 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04S 3/02 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE