Global Patent Index - EP 1013141 A1

EP 1013141 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRODUCING A STEREOPHONIC AUDIOSIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRODUCING A STEREOPHONIC AUDIOSIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR WIEDERGABE EINES STEREOPHONEN AUDIOSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR RESTITUER UN SIGNAL ACOUSTIQUE STEREOPHONIQUE

Publication

EP 1013141 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924041 A

Priority

  • DE 9800943 W
  • DE 19739425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739425A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for reproducing a stereophonic or multi-channel audiosignal in a space, especially a passenger compartment (10) of a motor vehicle. According to the invention, loudspeakers are arranged in several positions in said space for reproducing acoustic signals and the amplitude and phase of the acoustic signals emitted by each loudspeaker (1 to 7) are influenced in such a way that the wave fronts (83 to 87) of the acoustic signals emitted by said loudspeakers (1 to 7) superimpose to form a first resulting wave front for the left channel and a second resulting wave front (80) for the right channel of the stereophonic audiosignal. The resulting wave fronts intersect in an audibility zone within the space and give an impression of stereo sound within said audibility zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 5/02; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 5/02 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/02 (2013.01); H04R 2499/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913683A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739425 A1 19990311; AU 744020 B2 20020214; AU 7637898 A 19990329; EP 1013141 A1 20000628; EP 1013141 B1 20030423; JP 2001517005 A 20011002; US 6584202 B1 20030624; WO 9913683 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110403

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110403

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110403

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808087

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808087 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT