Global Patent Index - EP 1013148 A1

EP 1013148 A1 2000-06-28 - ELECTRIC HEATERS

Title (en)

ELECTRIC HEATERS

Title (de)

HEIZUNGSWIDERSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

RESISTANCES DE CHAUFFAGE ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1013148 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904301 A

Priority

  • GB 9800488 W
  • GB 9703225 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2322273A] The resistive track of a thick film heater comprises at least two distinct sections connected by a bridge 11 of lower resistance material eg silver to avoid overheating at sharp bends. The width of the tracks 7a-7f may vary so as to maintain a constant temperature profile. The arrangement may define areas of differing heat levels as shown in fig 5 and the track conductivity may be varied by over/under printing with low resistance material 8. Low resistance bridges may be used to link tracks broken around obstructions such as connecting boss 13. Various terminal locations are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/82; H05B 3/26; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/26 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01); H05B 3/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/748 (2013.01); H05B 3/262 (2013.01); H05B 3/82 (2013.01); H05B 2203/013 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01); H05B 2203/037 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2322273 A 19980819; GB 2322273 B 20010530; GB 9703225 D0 19970409; AU 6224398 A 19980908; CN 1130108 C 20031203; CN 1248384 A 20000322; CN 2325704 Y 19990623; DE 69803586 D1 20020314; DE 69803586 T2 20020808; EP 1013148 A1 20000628; EP 1013148 B1 20020123; EP 1161120 A2 20011205; EP 1161120 A3 20040121; ES 2171290 T3 20020901; HK 1029484 A1 20021108; WO 9836618 A1 19980820; ZA 9801287 B 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-09-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-09-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060407

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2006-05-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

- Effective date: 20020124

2006-05-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20020508

2006-04-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

- Effective date: 20020124

2006-04-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20020508

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

2002-09-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171290 T3

2002-07-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-07-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTTER CONTROLS LTD.

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803586 20020314

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL