Global patent index - EP 1013187 A1

EP 1013187 A1 2000-06-28 - Separable adjustable cushion for backpart moulding machine with tubular pressure element and flexible mould

Title (en)

Separable adjustable cushion for backpart moulding machine with tubular pressure element and flexible mould

Title (de)

Trennbares und einstellbares Kissen zum Vorformen der Ferse von Schuhschäften mit einem rohrförmigen Organ und einer biegsamen Form

Title (fr)

Coussin réglable et séparable pour moulage de la partie talon ayant un organe tubulaire et moule flexible

Publication

EP 1013187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98600016 A

Priority

GR 98020071 A

Abstract (en)

Separable cushion mechanism for forming the heel of the shoe uppers, which can be mounted on the backpart moulding machine with its symmetry axle at the projection of the shoe last axle. This forming cushion is composed of two equal arms (1) fixed and adjusted on one plate support (8) to create a symmetrical cavity. Two pneumatic flexible pressure tubes (2) are fixed on the internal side of this cavity and when they are activated by compressed air, they are forcing one flexible mould (3) 1-15 mm thickness (it depends on the case) to press the shoe upper on the aluminium last to take the desired shape. This mould is perimetrically free and can be turned round its pin (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 11/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013187 A1 20000628; EP 1013187 B1 20050302; ES 2239385 T3 20050916; PT 1013187 E 20050630

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2008-05-12 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-10-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2239385

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES IT PT

2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES IT PT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES IT PT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI