Global patent index - EP 1013197 A1

EP 1013197 A1 2000-06-28 - Shelving

Title (en)

Shelving

Title (de)

Regale

Title (fr)

Meuble d'étagères

Publication

EP 1013197 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403187 A

Priority

FR 9816311 A

Abstract (en)

The shelving has uprightts (10,12) and panels (14) with their ends received in openings (16) in the uprights. Each panel has a clearance formed between a horizontal face (14B) of the panel and the edge (16B) of the opening. At least two stops (20) are provided for each lateral extremity (15A) of the panel, each stop having a lock inserted into the stop face (16B) of the opening.

Abstract (fr)

Meuble d'étagères comportant des montants (10, 12) et des tablettes (14). Les montants sont formés par deux flancs (10, 12) présentant une pluralité de fenêtres (16), dans lesquelles les extrémités latérales (15A) des tablettes (14) sont susceptibles d'être insérées, de sorte que, à chaque extrémité (15A) d'une tablette, un jeu soit ménagé entre une face horizontale (14B) de la tablette, dénommée face de blocage et le bord (16B) de la fenêtre situé en regard de cette face, dénommé bord de blocage. Pour chaque tablette, le meuble comporte au moins deux éléments de blocage (20), un pour chaque extrémité latérale (15A) de la tablette, chaque élément de blocage comprenant un organe de serrage susceptible d'être inséré entre la face de blocage (14B) de la tablette et le bord de blocage (16B) de la fenêtre et d'être déplacé de manière à venir en contact avec ladite face de blocage pour bloquer la tablette. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/02; A47B 57/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013197 A1 20000628; EP 1013197 B1 20030917; DE 69911356 D1 20031023; DE 69911356 T2 20040722; FR 2787688 A1 20000630; FR 2787688 B1 20010316; US 6216892 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69911356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI