Global Patent Index - EP 1013208 A1

EP 1013208 A1 2000-06-28 - Grab bar with removable tray

Title (en)

Grab bar with removable tray

Title (de)

Sicherheitsgriff mit abnehmbarer Schale

Title (fr)

Poignée de sécurité associée à un bac de rangement amovible

Publication

EP 1013208 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410023 A

Priority

FR 9816381 A

Abstract (en)

The safety handle (10), having a fixing plate (14, 16) at each end is fitted with a container connected to the handle by a toothed positioning ring (20) engaging with a matching recess (38) in the container. The positioning ring is fitted beneath the handle's lower fixing plate (16) such that the container is in an upright position regardless of the angle of the handle.

Abstract (fr)

Un bac de rangement 26 peut être associé à une poignée 10 de sécurité au moyen d'un dispositif de fixation amovible comportant : au moins une rondelle de positionnement associée à une platine de montage 16, et équipée de premiers moyens d'assemblage, et une embase de retenue intégrée dans un évidement postérieur à la base du bac de rangement 26, et pourvue de deuxièmes moyens d'assemblage coopérant par emmanchement avec les premiers moyens d'assemblage lors de la mise en place du bac 26 sur la platine de montage 16. Applications : accessoires de salles de bains. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/00; A47K 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01); A47K 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/022 (2013.01); A47K 3/003 (2013.01); A47K 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013208 A1 20000628; FR 2787312 A1 20000623; FR 2787312 B1 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CUEL, VERONIQUE

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLARA, MARC

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CUTIVET, GERARD

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLIBERT

2001-05-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB LU NL

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI