Global Patent Index - EP 1013209 A3

EP 1013209 A3 2001-05-30 - Shower unit and accessories

Title (en)

Shower unit and accessories

Title (de)

Duscheinheit mit Accessoires

Title (fr)

Douche et accessoires

Publication

EP 1013209 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123820 A

Priority

  • DE 29822720 U
  • DE 19955831 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013209A2] The shower unit has at least one door element swiveling on an axle by means of hinges, and at least one fixed partition. (1). The partition has at least one vertical part (3) which is swivel or rotarily mounted on a hinge (4) towards the shower interior. The vertical part extends the entire height of the shower unit and contains accessories such as trays (5) and or towel-holders (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/28; A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013209 A2 20000628; EP 1013209 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/28 A, 7A 47K 3/36 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI