Global Patent Index - EP 1013212 A2

EP 1013212 A2 2000-06-28 - Improved electric household appliance usable as multipurpose accessory for vacuum cleaners and electric brooms and as stand-alone device

Title (en)

Improved electric household appliance usable as multipurpose accessory for vacuum cleaners and electric brooms and as stand-alone device

Title (de)

Mehrzweck elektrisches Haushaltsgerät einsetzbar als Staubsauger, elecktrischen Besen oder als eigenständige Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil electroménager utilisable comme aspirateur, balai électrique ou comme fdispositif autonome

Publication

EP 1013212 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124081 A

Priority

IT MI982672 A

Abstract (en)

An electric household appliance to be fitted according to the requirements on vacuum cleaners, electric brooms or the like and/or to be used as a stand-alone electric household appliance, comprising a base (21) with wheels (11a,11b), supporting an electric motor (3) which is kinematically connected to a roller-like implement (4), the base (2) being provided with means (14) for fixing to a vacuum cleaner, an electric broom or the like or to a handle, and with a seat (10a,10b) for the roller implement, characterized in that said seat (10a,10b) is provided with means (9a,19) for detachably accommodating said roller (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 5/34 (2006.01); A47L 9/02 (2006.01); A47L 9/04 (2006.01); A47L 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0411 (2013.01); A47L 5/34 (2013.01); A47L 9/0494 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013212 A2 20000628; EP 1013212 A3 20001108; IT 1304099 B1 20010307; IT MI982672 A1 20000614; JP 2000197595 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI