Global Patent Index - EP 1013316 A1

EP 1013316 A1 2000-06-28 - Alpine ski

Title (en)

Alpine ski

Title (de)

Alpinski

Title (fr)

Ski alpin

Publication

EP 1013316 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420242 A

Priority

FR 9816513 A

Abstract (en)

The alpine ski has a thinner section (13) at the rear of the ski binding zone (2) than at the front (12). The front section (20,33) of the binding plate (10) is fixed to the ski at the level of the raised front section (12) of the ski. The rear portion (21) of the plate is situated above the rear portion of the binding zone and is free to move longitudinally with respect to the ski.

Abstract (fr)

Ski alpin (1) comprenant : une planche de glisse (5) présentant une face supérieure comportant une zone (2) de montage de la fixation, centrée par rapport au point de montage du milieu de la chaussure ; une plaque (10, 32, 50, 60) rigide, localisée sur la planche (5) au niveau de la zone (2) de montage de la fixation, apte à recevoir une fixation de sécurité composée d'une butée (3) et d'une talonnière (4) montées respectivement sur la partie avant (20, 33) et sur la partie arrière (21, 34, 52, 61) de la plaque (10, 32, 50, 60), caractérisé en ce que : l'épaisseur (e1) de la planche de glisse dans la portion avant (12) de la zone (2) de montage de fixation est supérieure à l'épaisseur (e2) de la planche de glisse dans la portion arrière ( 13) de la zone (2) de montage de fixation ; la partie avant (20, 33) de la plaque (10, 32, 50, 60) est solidarisée à la face supérieure de la planche de glisse au niveau de la portion avant surélevée (12) de la zone (2) de montage de la fixation ; la partie arrière (21, 34, 52, 61) de la plaque (10, 32, 50, 60) est située au dessus de la portion arrière (13) de la zone (2) de montage de la fixation et est libre de mouvement relatif par rapport à la portion arrière (13) de la zone (2) de montage de la fixation du ski, dans le sens longitudinal du ski. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/04; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013316 A1 20000628; EP 1013316 B1 20040623; AT 269747 T 20040715; DE 69918252 D1 20040729; DE 69918252 T2 20050721; FR 2787722 A1 20000630; FR 2787722 B1 20010126; US 6325404 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918252 P 20040729

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI