Global Patent Index - EP 1013317 A1

EP 1013317 A1 2000-06-28 - Snow sliding board

Title (en)

Snow sliding board

Title (de)

Schneegleitbrett

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse

Publication

EP 1013317 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420243 A

Priority

FR 9816514 A

Abstract (en)

The snow ski (1) has a stepped upper surface with a lowered section (6) between the front section (3) of the binding zone and the rear portion of the latter. The thickness (e1) of the ski in the section in front of the binding zone is greater than the thickness (e2) of the ski in the rear portion (4) behind the binding.

Abstract (fr)

Planche de glisse (1) dont la face supérieure inclut une zone de montage (2) de la fixation, centrée par rapport au point de montage du milieu de la chaussure (19), destinée à recevoir : dans sa portion avant (3), la butée d'une fixation ; dans sa portion arrière (4), la talonnière d'une fixation ; caractérisée en ce qu'elle comporte un décrochement de hauteur (6) entre la portion avant (3) de la zone de montage (2) de la fixation et la portion arrière (4) de la zone de montage (2) de la fixation, de sorte que l'épaisseur (e1) de la planche de glisse dans la portion avant (3) de la zone (2) de montage de la fixation est supérieure à l'épaisseur (e2) de la planche de glisse dans la portion arrière (4) de la zone de montage (2) de la fixation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/04; A63C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A63C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/04 (2013.01); A63C 5/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013317 A1 20000628; EP 1013317 B1 20040421; AT 264703 T 20040515; DE 69916564 D1 20040527; DE 69916564 T2 20040916; FR 2787723 A1 20000630; FR 2787723 B1 20010126; US 6315317 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061215

2005-11-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916564 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI