Global Patent Index - EP 1013318 A2

EP 1013318 A2 2000-06-28 - Mounting plate and ski-binding

Title (en)

Mounting plate and ski-binding

Title (de)

Bindungsplattenanordnung und Skibindung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à plaque de fixation et fixation de ski

Publication

EP 1013318 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811179 A

Priority

CH 257098 A

Abstract (en)

The ski binding plate arrangement has a heel-holder and head-part. A binding plate has two fixture plates (4a,4b) for attaching the binding plate to the ski (1). A carriage (6) is between the fixture parts and has at least one axial guide (4c) for guiding the carriage in relation to the fixture parts. The carriage, after the binding plate is fixed to a ski, is guided by means of the guide. Each fixture part has at least two holes for fixture elements (5)

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Bindungsplattenanordnung für Skibindungen mit Fersenhalter (2) und Kopfteil (3), ist für den Fersenhalter und das Kopfteil je eine separate, in Skilängsrichtung längliche Bindungsplatte vorgesehen. Wenigsten eine, vorzugsweise die vordere dieser Bindungsplatten weist in Längsrichtung in Endbereichen Befestigungsteile (4a, 4b) zur Befestigung der Bindungsplatte am Ski (1) auf und dazwischen ein von den Befestigungsteilen (4a, 4b) getrennter Schlitten (6). Der Schlitten ist in einer mit den Befestigungsteilen (4a, 4b) verbundenen Führung (4c) derart geführt, dass dem Schlitten (6) nach Befestigung der Befestigungsteile (4a, 4b) am Ski (1) jede Verdrehung und jede Bewegung quer zur Längsrichtung gegenüber den Befestigungsteilen (4a, 4b) verunmöglicht ist. Einseitig liegt ein Bewegungsspielraum zwischen dem Schlitten (6) und dem Befestigungsteil (4a,4b) vor. Federmittel (8,10,18,24) sind darin derart angeordnet, dass sie einer diesen Bewegungsspielraum verkleinernden Kraft entgegenwirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013318 A2 20000628; EP 1013318 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI