Global Patent Index - EP 1013318 A3

EP 1013318 A3 2002-09-25 - Mounting plate and ski-binding

Title (en)

Mounting plate and ski-binding

Title (de)

Bindungsplattenanordnung und Skibindung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à plaque de fixation et fixation de ski

Publication

EP 1013318 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99811179 A

Priority

CH 257098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013318A2] The ski binding plate arrangement has a heel-holder and head-part. A binding plate has two fixture plates (4a,4b) for attaching the binding plate to the ski (1). A carriage (6) is between the fixture parts and has at least one axial guide (4c) for guiding the carriage in relation to the fixture parts. The carriage, after the binding plate is fixed to a ski, is guided by means of the guide. Each fixture part has at least two holes for fixture elements (5)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013318 A2 20000628; EP 1013318 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI