Global Patent Index - EP 1013335 A1

EP 1013335 A1 2000-06-28 - Method for selectively extracting ionic species from an aqueous solution

Title (en)

Method for selectively extracting ionic species from an aqueous solution

Title (de)

Verfahren zur selektiven Extraktion von Ionenarten aus einer wässrigen Lösung

Title (fr)

Procédé d'extraction sélective d'espèces ioniques d'une solution aqueuse

Publication

EP 1013335 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99420237 A

Priority

FR 9816589 A

Abstract (en)

A method for selectively extracting species from an aqueous solution which comprises contacting the aqueous solution with a membrane (17) capable of selectively transporting species from a liquid to another, the membrane (17) comprising a porous polymer support having an average surface pore size less than 100nm, coated with a continuous layer of a fluorinated polymer obtained by plasma energized chemical vapor deposition (PECVD) using a plasma containing at least one fluorinated compound. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 61/24; G03C 5/395; G03C 5/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/44 (2006.01); B01D 61/24 (2006.01); B01D 69/12 (2006.01); B01D 71/32 (2006.01); G03C 5/00 (2006.01); G03C 5/31 (2006.01); G03C 5/395 (2006.01); G03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 61/246 (2013.01); B01D 69/127 (2013.01); G03C 5/31 (2013.01); G03C 5/3956 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3712391 A1 19871119 - APPLIED MEMBRANE TECH [US]
  • [A] EP 0874277 A1 19981028 - EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]
  • [A] FR 2737792 A1 19970214 - KODAK PATHE [FR]
  • [X] PONCIN-EPAILLARD F ET AL: "PLASMA MODIFICATION OF CELLULOSE DERIVATIVES AS BIOMATERIALS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, vol. 44, no. 9, 25 March 1992 (1992-03-25), pages 1513 - 1521, XP000276245, ISSN: 0021-8995
  • [A] CLAROTTI G: "PLASMA DEPOSITION OF THIN FLUOROCARBON FILMS FOR INCREASED MEMBRANE HEMOCOMPATIBILITY*", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, vol. 61, no. 1, 1 September 1991 (1991-09-01), pages 289 - 301, XP000220286, ISSN: 0376-7388
  • [A] YONGLIE WU ET AL: "SURFACE-MODIFIED HYDROPHILIC MEMBRANES IN MEMBRANE DISTILLATION", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, vol. 72, no. 2, 4 September 1992 (1992-09-04), pages 189 - 196, XP000362049, ISSN: 0376-7388
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 472 (C - 0889) 29 November 1991 (1991-11-29) & DATABASE WPI Section Ch Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A88, AN 1991-301026, XP00211670411991-301026ChA88 & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 115, no. 22, 2 December 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 239253, XP002116701CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS1991120211522239253
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 070 (C - 479) 4 March 1988 (1988-03-04) & DATABASE WPI Section Ch Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A88, AN 1987-301757, XP00211670511987-301757ChA88 & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 16, 18 April 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 133046, XP002116702CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS1988041810816133046
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 200 (C - 431) 27 June 1987 (1987-06-27) & DATABASE WPI Section Ch Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A14, AN 1987-069504, XP00211670611987-069504ChA14 & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 10, 7 September 1987, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 80059, XP002116703CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS198709071071080059

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013335 A1 20000628; FR 2787727 A1 20000630; FR 2787727 B1 20020111; JP 2000189969 A 20000711; US 6210584 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050302

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI