Global Patent Index - EP 1013343 A1

EP 1013343 A1 2000-06-28 - Selfcleaning separator for cohesive or adhesive products

Title (en)

Selfcleaning separator for cohesive or adhesive products

Title (de)

Selbstreinigender Abscheider für kohäsive bzw. adhäsive Produkte

Title (fr)

Séparateur autonettoyant pour des produits cohésives ou adhésives

Publication

EP 1013343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124842 A

Priority

DE 19858966 A

Abstract (en)

The separator, based on a cyclone, includes a sidewall (4) in the upper section (8) comprising resilient, especially rubbery material.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein selbstreinigender Abscheider für kohäsive bzw. adhäsive Feststoffe aus einem fluidgeförderten Feststoffstrom auf Basis einer zyklonartigen Abscheidung beschrieben. Der Abscheider besteht wenigstens aus einem zylindrischen Oberteil (8) mit einem Abscheideraum (3), einem Produkteinlass (2), einem Fluidauslass (5) und aus einem konischen Unterteil (6) mit einem unterhalb des Unterteiles (6) anschließenden Feststoffauslass (7), wobei wenigstens die Seitenwand (4) des Oberteiles (8) aus einem elastischen, insbesondere einem gummielastischen Werkstoff hergestellt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04C 5/087

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/08 (2006.01); B04C 5/087 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 2331784 A1 19750123 - KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG
  • [X] DE 2443347 A1 19750320 - IFE GMBH & CO KG
  • [A] H.J. VAN EBBENHORST TENGBERGEN: "Dust cyclones - law of similarity - influence of the dust concentration", DE INGENIEUR - WERKTUIG- EN SCHEEPSBOUW, vol. 77, no. 2, 8 January 1965 (1965-01-08), pages (w)1 - (w)8, XP002134131

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013343 A1 20000628; DE 19858966 A1 20000706; JP 2000185244 A 20000704; US 2002014442 A1 20020207; US 6491167 B2 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI