Global Patent Index - EP 1013346 A1

EP 1013346 A1 2000-06-28 - Support for a fluid gun

Title (en)

Support for a fluid gun

Title (de)

Halterung für eine Fluidpistole

Title (fr)

Support pour un pistolet de fluide

Publication

EP 1013346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122938 A

Priority

DE 19859842 A

Abstract (en)

The holder arrangement includes a housing section with a wall section(2) ending in a free upper edge and which on the rear side covers a space(33) which accommodates a part of the gun(10). A recess(3) which is open at the top extends downwards in the wall section and leads into the rear space and cross sectionally encompasses the gun in its held state. The gun by gravity force rests by its holding element(21) against a stop face(2a) on the inner side of the wall. Independent claims are included for a holder body in which at least one of the wall sections has a recess open at the top to support the gun, and for a compressed air gun with a holder element in the form of a flat annular disc projecting at right angles to its longitudinal direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zur Halterung einer Fluid-, insbesondere Druckluft-Pistole (10) an einer von oben nach unten verlaufenden, externen Wandung (16) eines Gebäudes oder einer Maschine, mit einem daran befestigten, vorspringenden Halterungskörper (1), der zur Halterung der Pistole (10) eine Aufnahmeeinrichtung aufweist, und die Pistole (10) mit einem Halteelement (21) versehen ist, das bei gehalterter Pistole (10) mit dem Halterungskörper (1) in Eingriff steht, wobei die Aufnahmeeinrichtung folgendes umfaßt: einen in einer freien Oberkante endenden Wandungsabschnitt des Halterungskörpers, der rückseitig einen freien Hinterraum (33) des Halterungskörpers (1) zur Aufnahme eines Teils der Pistole (10) abdeckt, und eine nach oben offene, von der Oberkante ausgehend sich in dem Wandungsabschnitt nach unten erstreckende Frei- oder Aussparung (3), welche zum Hinterraum (33) führt und die gehalterte Pistole (10) querschnittlich umgibt und/oder erfaßt, wobei die gehalterte Pistole (10) durch die Schwerkraft mit ihrem Halteelement (21) im Hinterraum (33) in Anschlag an eine Innenseite des Wandungsabschnitts gebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013346 A1 20000628; EP 1013346 B1 20030205; AT 232143 T 20030215

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 232143 T

- Effective date: 20141118

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904217 P 20030313

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2002-07-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT FOR A FLUID GUN AND CORRESPONDING SUPPORTING DEVICE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI