Global Patent Index - EP 1013351 A2

EP 1013351 A2 2000-06-28 - Temper rolling method for steel plate and temper rolling mill

Title (en)

Temper rolling method for steel plate and temper rolling mill

Title (de)

Kaltnachwalzverfahren für Stahlblech und Kaltnachwalzwerk

Title (fr)

Procédé d'écrouissage à froid pour tôles d'acier et laminoir d'écrouissage

Publication

EP 1013351 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310136 A

Priority

JP 37029898 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a temper rolling method for temper rolling a steel plate for improving the brightness of the steel plate without requiring additional facilities and production steps. The method uses a steel plate containing 0.012 wt% or less of C and a temper rolling mill wherein at least the roll at the top front stand is a scratch bright roll having a surface roughness (Ra) of 1.2 mu m or less and at least the roll at the last stand is a bright roll having a surface roughness (Ra) of 0.5 mu m or less. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 27/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013351 A2 20000628; EP 1013351 A3 20021127; EP 1013351 B1 20040519; DE 69917416 D1 20040624; DE 69917416 T2 20050519; JP 2000197902 A 20000718; JP 3783439 B2 20060607; KR 100613948 B1 20060818; KR 20000048403 A 20000725; TR 9903256 A2 20000721; TW 458820 B 20011011

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *JFE STEEL CORP.

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051216

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041231

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917416 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 1/22 A, 7C 21D 8/02 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI