Global Patent Index - EP 1013361 A1

EP 1013361 A1 2000-06-28 - Mould pipe and process for recalibrating a mould pipe

Title (en)

Mould pipe and process for recalibrating a mould pipe

Title (de)

Kokillenrohr und Verfahren zum Rekalibrieren eines Kokillenrohrs

Title (fr)

Tube pour lingotière et procédé pour recalibrer un tube pour lingotière

Publication

EP 1013361 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124618 A

Priority

DE 19859040 A

Abstract (en)

A tubular mould, having an upper end with an outer groove (9) for fitting U-shaped flanges (10) and an offset portion (5) for fitting a stiffening frame (6), is new. A tubular mould, which is tightly fixed at its upper end in a water header (2) and is stabilized against cooling water pressure in this region, has (a) an outer circumferential groove (9) spaced from the upper end face (3) of the tube wall (4) for engagement from opposite sides by inner ribs (11) of U-shaped flanges (10), the ribs being shorter than the groove depth; and (b) a peripheral offset upper end portion (5) on which a stiffening frame (6) can be tightly fitted for sealing against the tube wall (4) and against the flange (18) of the water header (2), the frame being fixed by screws to the U-shaped flanges (10) and being supported on the water header flange (18). An Independent claim is also included for a method of recalibrating the above tubular mould.

Abstract (de)

Im Abstand zur oberen Stirnseite (3) der Rohrwand (4) des Kokillenrohrs (1) ist eine äußere Umfangsnut (9) vorgesehen. In diese fassen von gegenüberliegenden Seiten U-förmige Flansche (10) mit inneren Raststegen (11) ein. Die radiale Erstreckung der Raststege (11) ist kleiner als die Tiefe der Umfangsnut (9) bemessen. Benachbart zur oberen Stirnseite (7) ist ein umfangsseitiger Absatz (5) vorgesehen, an dem unter Abdichtung ein mit den Flanschen (10) verschraubbarer und sich am Flansch (28) des Wasserkastens (2) abstützender Versteifungsrahmen (6) paßgenau festlegbar ist. Bei einer Rekalibrierung des Kokillenrohrs (1), insbesondere durch Sprengumformen, reduziert sich die Wanddicke, so daß dann der Absatz (5) nachgearbeitet werden muß und lediglich ein neuer Versteifungsrahmen (6) aufgesetzt und mit den Flanschen (20) verspannt zu werden braucht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/057 (2013.01); B22D 11/0406 (2013.01); B22D 11/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013361 A1 20000628; EP 1013361 B1 20030716; AR 021555 A1 20020724; AT 245065 T 20030815; AU 6438999 A 20000622; AU 762008 B2 20030619; BR 9907382 A 20000829; CA 2292444 A1 20000621; CN 1257763 A 20000628; DE 19859040 A1 20000629; DK 1013361 T3 20031110; ES 2198841 T3 20040201; JP 2000190052 A 20000711; KR 20000047681 A 20000725; PL 337308 A1 20000703; PT 1013361 E 20031231; TW 424019 B 20010301; US 6443218 B1 20020903; ZA 9906651 B 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KM EUROPA METAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041211

2005-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-07-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KM EUROPA METAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-12-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-12-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-12-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041204

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198841 T3

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403913

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906294 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI