Global Patent Index - EP 1013363 A1

EP 1013363 A1 2000-06-28 - Apparatus for die casting material having a high melting temperature

Title (en)

Apparatus for die casting material having a high melting temperature

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Druckgiessen von Material mit hohem Schmelzpunkt

Title (fr)

Dispositif de moulage sous pression de matériaux a haut point de fusion

Publication

EP 1013363 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99310240 A

Priority

US 11356698 P

Abstract (en)

A die casting apparatus for making articles composed of material having a melting temperature in excess of 2000 F, such as superalloys and titanium alloys includes a melting unit 24 for melting at least a charge of the material, and a multi part, die-cavity-defining die 36. A generally cylindrical shot sleeve 30 of the apparatus is in fluid communication with the die 36, and receives molten material from the melting unit 24. The sleeve 30 has outer and inner radii Ro, Ri. The apparatus also includes a plunger unit 40 in sealing and moveable engagement with the shot sleeve 30. The plunger 40 moves along a plunger stroke, for forcing material from the shot sleeve 30 into the die cavity 38. At least the radii and the ratio of the outer to inner radii are selected to minimize thermal distortion of the sleeve when molten material is poured into the sleeve. Preferably the inner radius Ri is at least 25 mm and the ratio Ro/Ri at least 1.3 Preferably, the shot sleeve 30 defines a volume that is at least 2 times the die cavity volume 38. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/2023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013363 A1 20000628; EP 1013363 B1 20050302; CN 1122587 C 20031001; CN 1260254 A 20000719; DE 69923930 D1 20050407; DE 69923930 T2 20060406; ES 2235445 T3 20050701; IL 133607 A 20040328; IL 133607 D0 20010430; JP 2000197957 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131220

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69923930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131220

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69923930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235445

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI