Global patent index - EP 1013381 A3

EP 1013381 A3 2000-07-26 - Powder-actuated fastener driving tool

Title (en)

Powder-actuated fastener driving tool

Title (de)

Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement actionné par poudre

Publication

EP 1013381 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99811162 A

Priority

DE 19860194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013381A2] The powder force operated hammer has a drive-piston (6) positioned in a hole (2) in a guide cylinder (1) and a support (3) joined to the guide cylinder. The end of the support opposite the hammering direction has a cartridge holder (10). The end of the support pointing in the hammering direction has a first active surface (4) from which protrudes a cylindrical protuberance (11) whose end side forms a second active surface (5). The drive piston has a thrust surface (13) cooperating with the first active surface. A cylindrical recess (12) holding the cylindrical protuberance extends from the thrust surface. The second and first active surfaces are connected by means of a connecting duct (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14; B25C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/08 (2006.01); B25C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/14 (2013.01); B25C 1/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013381 A2 20000628; EP 1013381 A3 20000726; EP 1013381 B1 20030924; AU 5950299 A 20000629; AU 756123 B2 20030102; CA 2292060 A1 20000624; CA 2292060 C 20060411; DE 19860194 A1 20000629; JP 2000210881 A 20000802; US 6289789 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-12-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061216

2005-12-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 25C 1/14 A, 7B 25C 1/08 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI