Global Patent Index - EP 1013382 A1

EP 1013382 A1 2000-06-28 - Cartridge magazine

Title (en)

Cartridge magazine

Title (de)

Kartuschenmagazin

Title (fr)

Magasin de cartouches

Publication

EP 1013382 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811069 A

Priority

DE 19859320 A

Abstract (en)

The cartridge magazine has a strip-shaped support element (1) containing cartridges (2) containing propellant. One first free end of the support element tapers (11) and has decreasing width at right angles to the lengthwise extension of the support element and at right angles to the lengthwise axes of the cartridges. The support element has at least one locking surface (7,8) pointing towards the tapered part. The blocking surface is formed by the end surface of a slat (10) positioned on a side of the support element.

Abstract (de)

Das Kartuschenmagazin weist ein streifenförmiges Trägerelement (1) und mehrere Treibmittel enthaltende Kartuschen (2) auf. Das Trägerelement (1) weist eine Verjüngung (11) mit abnehmender Breite (B) auf. Zwischen der Verjüngung (11) und einer der Verjüngung (11) am nächsten liegenden Kartusche (2) weist das Trägerelement (1) wenigstens eine zum freien Ende der Verjüngung (11) weisende Sperrfläche (7, 8) auf, die das Einschieben des Kartuschenmagazins in Setzgeräte verhindert, in denen die Treibmittel nicht vollständig verbrennen und daher eine schnelle Verschmutzung des Setzgerätes hervorrufen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/16; F42B 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/16 (2006.01); B25C 1/18 (2006.01); F42B 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/085 (2013.01); B25C 1/163 (2013.01); Y10S 224/931 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4136932 A1 19930513 - HILTI AG [LI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013382 A1 20000628; EP 1013382 B1 20040218; AT 259693 T 20040315; CA 2292055 A1 20000622; CA 2292055 C 20060627; CZ 293440 B6 20040414; CZ 9903453 A3 20000712; DE 19859320 A1 20000629; JP 2000185993 A 20000704; PL 188924 B1 20050531; PL 337360 A1 20000703; US 6276253 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061118

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908580 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI NL

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI