Global Patent Index - EP 1013422 A2

EP 1013422 A2 2000-06-28 - Drop generator for long array ink jet printer

Title (en)

Drop generator for long array ink jet printer

Title (de)

Tropfenerzeuger für Tintenstrahldrucker mit einer langen Düsenreihe

Title (fr)

Générateur de gouttes pour imprimante à jet d'encre à longue rangée d'orifices

Publication

EP 1013422 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309513 A

Priority

US 21105998 A

Abstract (en)

A drop generator for use in an ink jet printer is capable of stimulating long ink jet arrays at high operating frequencies. The drop generator comprises a substantially uniform cross section for a central portion and two end sections with different cross sections. The end sections have features to adjust a resonant frequency of the end sections to match that of the central portion. In particular, these features comprise cuts on a top of the drop generator. The drop generator utilizes multi-lobed radial bending modes for vibration of an array of orifices, and the vibrational modes are driven by at least two rows of transducers which extend substantially the length of the drop generator. The transducers are placed consistent with a lobe structure of an operational radial bending mode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/04; B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/025 (2006.01); B41J 2/03 (2006.01); B41J 2/04 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/025 (2013.01); B41J 2/03 (2013.01); B41J 2/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013422 A2 20000628; EP 1013422 A3 20010404; EP 1013422 B1 20060823; CA 2292239 A1 20000614; DE 69932914 D1 20061005; DE 69932914 T2 20070405; EP 1602484 A2 20051207; EP 1602484 A3 20090107; EP 1602484 B1 20110921; JP 2000218785 A 20000808; JP 2009190415 A 20090827; JP 4417499 B2 20100217; JP 4886817 B2 20120229

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69932914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69932914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/025 A

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI