Global Patent Index - EP 1013424 A3

EP 1013424 A3 2001-01-03 - Apparatus and method for controlling a charging voltage in ink jet printers

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for controlling a charging voltage in ink jet printers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Regelung der Ladespannung in Tintenstrahlschreibern

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode pour le réglage de la tension de charge dans les imprimantes à projection d'encre

Publication

EP 1013424 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309534 A

Priority

US 21107998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013424A2] The present invention provides for adjustment of the charging voltage to a discrete section of the array, increasing the operating range of the printhead. The array of charging electrodes (22) are broken into segments with relative voltage adjustment to each segment. The voltage to the charge plate electrodes is then switchably controlled by discrete high voltage driver chips (56) to enable drop selection for printing. The integrated circuit within each chip converts serial input data at low voltages to parallel outputs at high voltage. The supplied high voltage to each of these chips is varied to compensate for impact variations on the catcher face caused by non-uniform parts. The compensation levels required for a set of aligned parts are stored within the printhead memory. The printhead will then function with the correct compensation levels on any system in which it is installed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/075 (2006.01); B41J 2/085 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013424 A2 20000628; EP 1013424 A3 20010103; EP 1013424 B1 20070912; CA 2292412 A1 20000614; DE 69937095 D1 20071025; DE 69937095 T2 20080612; JP 2000218794 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69937095

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141129

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141129

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937095 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI