Global Patent Index - EP 1013425 A2

EP 1013425 A2 2000-06-28 - Print window improvement for continous ink jet printer

Title (en)

Print window improvement for continous ink jet printer

Title (de)

Verbesserung des Druckspannungsbereiches für einen kontinuierlichen Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Amélioration de la plage de tension d'impression d'une imprimante à jet d'encre continu

Publication

EP 1013425 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309553 A

Priority

US 21120498 A

Abstract (en)

A system and method are provided for improving the operating latitude for the charging and deflection voltage of an ink jet printhead, by catching non-print drops (16) with a wall impinging catcher to form a fluid layer in a face (10) of the catcher; and lowering drag on the fluid layer on the catcher face. This is accomplished by providing a drop generator for producing ink drops and a catcher/charge plate assembly for catching and recirculating non print drops. A printhead frame maintains the alignment of the drop generator and the catcher/charge plate assembly. Temperature induced distortion of these components is eliminated by heating them to a constant temperature. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/085; B41J 2/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/07 (2006.01); B41J 2/085 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/085 (2013.01); B41J 2/072 (2013.01); B41J 2/185 (2013.01); B41J 2002/1853 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4757328 A 19880712 - BRAUN HILARION [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013425 A2 20000628; EP 1013425 A3 20000823; CA 2292084 A1 20000614; JP 2000218831 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040116

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI