Global Patent Index - EP 1013433 A2

EP 1013433 A2 2000-06-28 - Multi-tabbed orifice plates

Title (en)

Multi-tabbed orifice plates

Title (de)

Düsenplatte mit mehreren Laschen

Title (fr)

Plaques à orifices à plusieurs pattes

Publication

EP 1013433 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309503 A

Priority

US 21120598 A

Abstract (en)

An orifice plate for an ink jet printing system has improved fabrication. The orifice plates (10) are formed as part of a larger panel (12). They are mechanically attached to the larger panel and electrically connected to it by means a large number of uniformly space narrow bridge members (18). These bridge members each converge to a narrow point at the edge of the orifice plate to cause the bridge to detach from the edge of the orifice plate when the orifice plate is to be removed from the larger panel at the time of orifice plate bonding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/162 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4972204 A 19901120 - SEXTON RICHARD W [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013433 A2 20000628; EP 1013433 A3 20000823; CA 2292093 A1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090721

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060918

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI