Global Patent Index - EP 1013440 A3

EP 1013440 A3 2000-11-15 - Fluid flush system for ink jet printing system

Title (en)

Fluid flush system for ink jet printing system

Title (de)

Fluidspülanlage für ein Tintenstrahldrucksystem

Title (fr)

Systeme fluide de nettoyage pour syteme d'impression a jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1013440 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309554 A

Priority

US 21102798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013440A2] A system and method for flushing ink residue from a fluid system of a continuous ink jet printer system are provided. Flush fluid is supplied to all fluid lines of the fluid system which normally contain ink, and the ink is removed or drained from the fluid system. The inside of the ink tank (12) is then rinsed with the flush fluid. After the rinsing is complete, the flush fluid is removed from the fluid system and the fluid lines. Typically, the flush fluid is pumped through the system to clean the system, and air is pumped through the system to remove the flush fluid. The flush fluid is preferably a pressurized flush fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1714 (2013.01); B41J 2/1707 (2013.01); B41J 2/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013440 A2 20000628; EP 1013440 A3 20001115; EP 1013440 B1 20070704; CA 2292104 A1 20000614; DE 69936436 D1 20070816; DE 69936436 T2 20080124; JP 2000218819 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121129

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69936436

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69936436

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI