Global patent index - EP 1013444 A1

EP 1013444 A1 2000-06-28 - Ink tank cartridge and container therefor

Title (en)

Ink tank cartridge and container therefor

Title (de)

Tintenvorratspatrone und Behälter dafür

Title (fr)

Cartouche de réservoir d'encre et son conteneur

Publication

EP 1013444 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200827 A

Priority

  • EP 97200694 A
  • EP 92307270 A
  • JP 1283492 A
  • JP 3222692 A
  • JP 5815192 A
  • JP 19340292 A

Abstract (en)

An ink tank cartridge (5) is disclosed including a housing (11,50) removeably mounted onto an ink supply needle (14,90) of the ink-jet type recording apparatus body. The housing being provided with an ink supply port (15,53,71) projecting outwardly from a bottom surface of the housing. A porous member (21,64) for impregnating ink is positioned inside the housing abutting against the ink supply port through a filter (17,55). The ink tank cartridge being further provided with a packing member (19,57,73) resiliently abutting against an outer periphery of the ink supply needle at the end of the ink supply port. An end opening is sealed with a sealing member (20,60,77) through which the ink supply needle penetrates. Accordingly, the ink tank cartridge of the invention is advantageous in that the ink supply needle does not require a sharp tip, air is prevented from entering the ink supply path of the recording apparatus, and a tight air-seal between the ink supply needle and the ink tank can be maintained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17533 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17523 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0408241 A2 19910116 - OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]
  • [XA] DE 2709730 A1 19780907 - OLYMPIA WERKE AG
  • [X] US 4156244 A 19790522 - ERIKSON ROLF B [US], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 122 (M - 1226) 27 March 1992 (1992-03-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 364 (M - 747) 29 September 1988 (1988-09-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 416 (M - 759) 4 November 1988 (1988-11-04)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 272 (M - 1134) 10 July 1991 (1991-07-10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0553535 A1 19930804; EP 0553535 B1 19981028; EP 0553535 B2 20040414; DE 69227441 D1 19981203; DE 69227441 T2 19990318; DE 69227441 T3 20040909; DE 69232194 D1 20011213; DE 69232194 T2 20020718; DE 69232243 D1 20020110; DE 69232243 T2 20020725; DE 69232893 D1 20030213; DE 69232893 T2 20031106; DE 69233371 D1 20040722; DE 69233371 T2 20050616; DE 69233784 D1 20100610; EP 0782927 A1 19970709; EP 0782927 B1 20011107; EP 0786352 A1 19970730; EP 0786352 B1 20011128; EP 1013444 A1 20000628; EP 1013444 B1 20030108; EP 1241012 A2 20020918; EP 1241012 A3 20030102; EP 1241012 B1 20040616; EP 1396344 A2 20040310; EP 1396344 A3 20040728; EP 1905599 A2 20080402; EP 1905599 A3 20090408; EP 1905599 B1 20100428; HK 1002449 A1 20020419; HK 1010709 A1 20000505; HK 1021810 A1 20020920; HK 1025932 A1 20030815; HK 1046666 A1 20050204; SG 46602 A1 19980220

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120808

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120806

2012-08-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20120806

2012-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-08-15 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20120807

2012-08-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69232893

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-02-10 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S72Z

- Free Format Text: COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION DISMISSED; COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE HIGH COURT ON 22 DECEMBER 2006 DISMISSED BY COURT ORDER 23 MARCH 2009 IN RESPECT OF THE SECOND DEFENDANT (HC06CO0629).

2008-10-01 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S72Z

2008-02-13 [REG GB 772N] PROCEEDING UNDER SECTION 72 PATENTS ACT 1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: 772N

- Free Format Text: COUNTERCLAIM DISMISSED

2007-05-23 [REG GB 772N] PROCEEDING UNDER SECTION 72 PATENTS ACT 1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: 772N

- Free Format Text: COUNTERCLAIM STAYED

2007-03-07 [REG GB 7276] COUNTER CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED IN THE PAT. COURT (SECTION 72)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 7276

2007-01-24 [REG GB 7276] COUNTER CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED IN THE PAT. COURT (SECTION 72)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 7276

- Free Format Text: COUNTERCLAIM LODGED AT THE HIGH COURT

2007-01-12 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2005-11-23 [REG GB 7276] COUNTER CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED IN THE PAT. COURT (SECTION 72)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 7276

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69232893

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 553535

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2003-01-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 786352

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-06-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 553535

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 786352

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE