Global Patent Index - EP 1013451 A3

EP 1013451 A3 2000-11-29 - System for controlling ink temperature using a heated umbilical

Title (en)

System for controlling ink temperature using a heated umbilical

Title (de)

Gerät zur Kontrolle der Tintentemperatur mittels einer erwärmten Verbindung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour contrôler la température d'encre muni d'un cable ombilical chauffé

Publication

EP 1013451 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309508 A

Priority

US 21106698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013451A2] An improvement in the heating of ink in an ink jet printer having a printhead (34) and a fluid system (35) for supplying ink to the printhead via at least one umbilical (50), is provided. The improved ink heating technique proposes a fluid tube through which the ink flows and a heater (48) in close thermal contact with the fluid tube for supplying heat to a significant length of the fluid tubing. Thermal insulation can enclose the fluid tubing and the heater, and a protective covering can enclose the thermal insulation. An elastomeric layer can be situated between the fluid tubing and the heater, while maintaining close thermal contact between the fluid tubing and the heater. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/07 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/072 (2013.01); B41J 2/175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 4337469 A 19820629 - TAKANO RIKUO, et al
  • [X] US 5821963 A 19981013 - SUTERA RICHARD [US], et al
  • [X] US 5784279 A 19980721 - BARLAGE III WILLIAM BERDELL [US], et al
  • [A] US 4814786 A 19890321 - HOISINGTON PAUL A [US], et al
  • [A] US 5451989 A 19950919 - KADOWAKI HIDEJIRO [JP], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 02 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 031 (M - 192) 8 February 1983 (1983-02-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 172 (M - 154) 7 September 1982 (1982-09-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 368 (M - 1443) 12 July 1993 (1993-07-12)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013451 A2 20000628; EP 1013451 A3 20001129; EP 1013451 B1 20040915; CA 2292231 A1 20000614; DE 69920151 D1 20041021; DE 69920151 T2 20050922; JP 2000218820 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69920151

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920151 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010501

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI