Global Patent Index - EP 1013455 A2

EP 1013455 A2 2000-06-28 - A printer with donor and receiver media supply trays each adapted to allow a printer to sense type of media therein, and method of assembling the printer and trays

Title (en)

A printer with donor and receiver media supply trays each adapted to allow a printer to sense type of media therein, and method of assembling the printer and trays

Title (de)

Drucker mit Transfer- und Empfangsmedienzuführkassetten, die alle einem Drucker erlauben, den Medientyp zu erfassen, und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau von Drucker und Kassetten

Title (fr)

Imprimante avec des cassettes d'alimentation à médias de transfer et de réception chacune adaptée à permettre à l'imprimante de détecter le type de medium et procédé d'assemblage de l'imprimante et des supports

Publication

EP 1013455 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204113 A

Priority

US 21859598 A

Abstract (en)

A printer with donor and receiver media supply trays each adapted to allow a printer to sense type of media therein, and method of assembling the printer and trays. Donor and receiver media supply trays (60, 120) to be loaded into the printer (10) are adapted to allow the printer to sense type of media therein. Each supply tray comprises a tray body (65, 135) having a supply of the media (i.e., donor or receiver) therein. A transceiver (240) is disposed proximate the trays. The transceiver is capable of transmitting a first electromagnetic field (245) and sensing a second electromagnetic field (247). A first transponder (250) is integrally connected to the receiver supply tray and has encoded data previously stored therein indicative of the type of receiver media. A second transponder (260) is integrally connected to the donor supply tray and also has encoded data previously stored therein indicative of the type of donor media. Each transponder is capable of receiving the first electromagnetic field to power the transponder and then generating the second electromagnetic field as the transponder is powered. The second electromagnetic field is characteristic of the data previously stored in the transponder and is indicative of type of media contained within the tray. Data stored in the receiver tray transponder attached to the receiver supply tray is necessarily different from data stored in the donor tray transponder. The printer then operates in accordance with the data sensed by the transceiver to produce quality prints consistent with the type of donor and receiver being used. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/48; B41J 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 17/32 (2006.01); B65H 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/266 (2013.01); B41J 11/48 (2013.01); B41J 13/009 (2013.01); B41J 13/103 (2013.01); B41J 17/32 (2013.01); B65H 2405/311 (2013.01); B65H 2511/40 (2013.01); B65H 2557/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/40 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013455 A2 20000628; EP 1013455 A3 20001206; EP 1013455 B1 20060215; DE 69929849 D1 20060420; DE 69929849 T2 20061026; JP 2000185825 A 20000704; JP 4130520 B2 20080806; US 6628316 B1 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69929849

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69929849

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69929849

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI