Global Patent Index - EP 1013458 A3

EP 1013458 A3 2000-11-08 - Monolithic ink jet printing chassis

Title (en)

Monolithic ink jet printing chassis

Title (de)

Monolithisches Tintenstrahldruckchassis

Title (fr)

Chassis d' impression à jet d' encre monolithique

Publication

EP 1013458 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309494 A

Priority

US 21151898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013458A2] A printhead alignment apparatus is provided for use with a continuous ink jet printer. A single chassis maintains alignment of the droplet generator and the catcher/charge plate assembly (14). Electronic and fluidic components are attached to the single chassis, with the single chassis separating the electronic and fluid related functions of the printhead. Also, mounting features and connections of the electronic and fluid related functions are separated from mounting features of the catcher and the droplet generator. Connections for the electronic and fluid related functions are in a plane parallel to the plane of the catcher. The single chassis also accurately locates an eyelid mechanism relative to the droplet generator and the catcher/charge plate assembly (14). Finally, the single chassis has a z-axis length larger than its x-axis depth, with the z-axis length being perpendicular to a plane of the catcher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013458 A2 20000628; EP 1013458 A3 20001108; EP 1013458 B1 20030813; CA 2292103 A1 20000614; DE 69910340 D1 20030918; DE 69910340 T2 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071129

2006-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061103

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910340 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI