Global patent index - EP 1013466 A2

EP 1013466 A2 2000-06-28 - Intermediate ink-receiver sheet for transfer printing

Title (en)

Intermediate ink-receiver sheet for transfer printing

Title (de)

Farbstoffempfangsfolie für den Transferdruck

Title (fr)

Feuille intermédiaire réceptrice d'encre pour l'impression par transfert

Publication

EP 1013466 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310339 A

Priority

US 21858198 A

Abstract (en)

A transferable image media having, a carrier support; a release layer including a matting agent, an optional hydrophobic protection layer and an ink receptive layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/035; B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/035 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/035 (2013.01); B41M 5/502 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013466 A2 20000628; EP 1013466 A3 20010502; AU 6541999 A 20000629; JP 2000313166 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI