Global Patent Index - EP 1013468 A1

EP 1013468 A1 2000-06-28 - Method and apparatus for roughening the surface of a support for light-sensistive coating

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for roughening the surface of a support for light-sensistive coating

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufrauhen eines Trägers für lichtempfindliche Schichten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le grainage électrochimique de la surface d'un support pour plaque photosensible

Publication

EP 1013468 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125071 A

Priority

DE 19859216 A

Abstract (en)

Support, for radiation sensitive layers, is electrochemically roughened in an aqueous electrolyte bath, optionally after mechanical roughening, by three-phase or alternating current application to electrodes facing the support which travels continuously through the bath, a direct voltage being additionally applied to the support before or at the start of support passage in front of the electrodes. An Independent claim is also included for equipment for carrying out the above process, comprising (a) an electrolyte bath (1) containing three-phase current electrodes (4-6) connected to the secondary side of a three-phase current transformer (9), the primary side of which is connected via regulating transformers to a power transformer; and (b) a d.c. (direct current) source (8) with its poles connected to two d.c. electrodes or to a d.c. electrode (3) and the support (2). Preferred Features: The d.c. source (8) is connected with its minus pole to the support (2) and with its plus pole to the d.c. electrode (3) or vice-versa. The three-phase current electrodes (4-6) may be positioned upstream of the d.c. electrode (3), on either side of the d.c. electrode or downstream of two mutually isolated d.c. electrodes. When the support is anodized after passage through the bath, the direct voltage may be applied to a d.c. electrode upstream of the three-phase electrodes and to a current supply to the anodizing bath. A direct voltage may be applied to a d.c. electrode and to a three-phase or alternating current transformer, the d.c. electrode being positioned upstream of the three-phase current electrodes and being connected to the plus pole of the d.c. source, while the minus pole of the d.c. source is connected to the middle phase of the three-phase current transformer or to a center point of the alternating voltages of the two windings of the alternating current transformer. The direct voltage may be pulsed, (part of) the positive half waves of the pulsed direct voltage being applied to the support.

Abstract (de)

Zur Vermeidung bzw. zum Minimieren des Auftretens von Querschlägen bzw. Stromschlägen auf einem Träger 2, der in einem Elektrolytbad 1 elektrochemisch aufgerauht wird, wirkt zu Beginn der Trägerbewegung durch das Elektrolytbad eine Gleichspannung auf den Träger ein. Danach wirkt in der Aufrauhungszone Drehstrom bzw. Wechselstrom auf den Träger ein Hierzu sind Drehstromelektroden 4, 5 , 6 in dem Elektrolytbad angeordnet, die mit der Sekundärseite eines Drehstromtransformators 9 verbunden sind. Die Primärseite des Drehstromtransformators ist über Regeltransformatoren an einen Leistungstransformator für Drehstrom angeschlossen. In Transportrichtung A des Trägers 2 befindet sich eine Gleichstromelektrode 3 vor den Drehstromelektroden 4,5,6. Die Gleichstromelektrode 3 ist mit dem Pluspol einer Gleichstromquelle 8 verbunden, deren Minuspol 7 über einen Schleifer, eine Kontaktwalze oder eine ähnliche Einrichtung mit dem Träger 2 in Kontakt steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/034 (2013.01); B41N 3/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013468 A1 20000628; BR 9905919 A 20000912; DE 19859216 A1 20000629; US 6261438 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI