Global Patent Index - EP 1013470 A1

EP 1013470 A1 2000-06-28 - Method for making a book block out of folded, stitched printed sheets and apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Method for making a book block out of folded, stitched printed sheets and apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Buchblockes aus gefaltenen, genähten und gedruckten Blättern und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la fabrication d'un bloc de livre fait de feuilles pliées, imprimées et brochées, et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 1013470 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811262 A

Priority

EP 98811262 A

Abstract (en)

Method and appliance for producing an inner book consist of a stitcher (8) stitching the printed sheets (2) on the fold and opposite sides. The stitcher cooperates with a feeder (5) which displaces the printed sheets transferred from a conveyor (1) into a stitching position at right angles to it. The feeder has an accelerator gripping the printed sheet at the conveyor end of the conveyor, and aligning the sheets . The feeder has a conveyor section in the form of a liftable stitching saddle (14) coming after an entry section (19),

Abstract (de)

Für das Herstellen eines Buchblockes (11) für Bücher, werden die in einer bestimmten Reihenfolge zugeführten Druckbogen (2) über einen Zuförderer (1) einer Beschickungsvorrichtung (5) zugeführt und von letzterer beschleunigend in eine mit einer seitlich beabstandeten Hefteinrichtung (8) korrespondierende Heftlage versetzt, wobei die Beschickungsvorrichtung (5) vor dem Eintreffen eines Druckbogens (2) in der Heftlage zur Hefteinrichtung hin bewegt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/04 (2006.01); B42B 2/00 (2006.01); B42B 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013470 A1 20000628; EP 1013470 B1 20030709; AT 244645 T 20030715; DE 59808997 D1 20030814; JP 2000190656 A 20000711; JP 4490534 B2 20100630; US 2004046303 A1 20040311

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161224

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161224

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161224

2017-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 244645 T

- Effective date: 20161224

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808997

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808997 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI