Global patent index - EP 1013475 A2

EP 1013475 A2 2000-06-28 - Drawing apparatus and drawing-data output apparatus

Title (en)

Drawing apparatus and drawing-data output apparatus

Title (de)

Zeichengerät und Ausgabegerät für graphische Daten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dessin et dispositif de sortie de données de dessin

Publication

EP 1013475 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125796 A

Priority

JP 37156798 A

Abstract (en)

A writing-implement hold unit 12 holds a writing implement whose drawing density or drawing size varies according to drawing pressure or drawing speed. A paper hold unit 13 holds a sheet of paper. A drawing-data generation section 10 generates drawing data an image drawn on a sheet. A drawing control section 11 controls a drawing drive unit 14 by using the drawing data generated by the drawing-data generation section 10. The drawing drive unit 14 drives the writing-implement hold unit 12 in accordance with control of the drawing control section 11. The drawing drive unit 14 moves in at least three directions by varying a relative positional relationship between the writing implement held by the writing-implement hold unit 12 and the paper held by the paper hold unit 13. With this movement, the drawing drive unit 14 draws characters like those written by a person with a writing implement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 13/00; G06K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/13 (2006.01); B43L 13/00 (2006.01); B43L 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 13/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0768993 A 19950314 - NEC CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013475 A2 20000628; EP 1013475 A3 20021127; JP 2000190691 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 43L 13/00 A, 7G 06K 9/00 B, 7B 43L 13/02 B, 7G 06K 15/22 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI