Global Patent Index - EP 1013552 A1

EP 1013552 A1 2000-06-28 - Conveyor-wrapper unit for a packaging machine

Title (en)

Conveyor-wrapper unit for a packaging machine

Title (de)

Transport- und Umhüllungsvorrichtung einer Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Ensemble de transport et d'enveloppement pour une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1013552 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99123293 A

Priority

IT BO980147 U

Abstract (en)

-A conveyor-wrapper unit comprises two suspended plates (6a, 6b), which extend longitudinally and vertically, and are supported in a detachable manner by the uprights (1a, 1b) of the frame, by means of securing/release means (77a, 4a, 5a, 4b, 5b). -The said suspended plates (6a, 6b) support two or more conveyor-means (15, 17, 19), which are oriented longitudinally, disposed in succession, and can translate the objects along a segmented translation path, and a wrapper (74), which is oriented longitudinally, and which includes one or more wrapping bars (59), which are oriented transversely, and are moved along an orbital path which circumscribes one (17) of the said conveyor-means (15, 17, 19). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/10; B65B 59/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/10 (2006.01); B65B 59/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/10 (2013.01); B65B 59/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013552 A1 20000628; IT 244819 Y1 20020314; IT BO980147 U1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONVEYOR-WRAPPER UNIT FOR A PACKAGING MACHINE

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI