Global patent index - EP 1013553 A1

EP 1013553 A1 2000-06-28 - A method and a unit for packaging products

Title (en)

A method and a unit for packaging products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einheit zum Verpacken von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des objets

Publication

EP 1013553 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830774 A

Priority

IT BO980709 A

Abstract (en)

Products of parallelepiped shape are packaged in wrappers (7) with two end folds (21), fashioned by folding a sheet (6) of wrapping material initially to obtain a part-enveloping tubular sheath with a flap (18) of each end fold (21) projecting beyond a corresponding corner edge (13) of the product (5). The wrapper is completed by advancing the product in a direction parallel to the corner edges (13) and through a conditioning station (S) where the flaps (18) are first made to curl temporarily, each along an intermediate band (31) located between the edge (19) joined to the wrapper which coincides with the line of the relative end fold (21) and with the corner edge (13), and a free edge (20) opposite the joined edge (19), then gummed along a further band (33) located between the intermediate band (31) and the free edge (20); thereafter, each flap (18) is bent square along the joined edge (19) and flattened against the product (5) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/22 (2006.01); B65B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/004 (2013.01); B65B 11/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013553 A1 20000628; EP 1013553 B1 20050525; DE 69925446 D1 20050630; DE 69925446 T2 20060202; IT 1304256 B1 20010313; IT BO980709 A1 20000622; IT BO980709 D0 19981222

INPADOC legal status

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091213

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091213

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081020

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69925446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI