Global patent index - EP 1013563 A1

EP 1013563 A1 2000-06-28 - Separating element for stocking and transporting yarn spools on a pallet

Title (en)

Separating element for stocking and transporting yarn spools on a pallet

Title (de)

Trennteile zum Lagern und Transportieren von Garnspulen auf einer Palette

Title (fr)

Eléments séparateurs pour stocker et transporter des bobines de fils textiles sur une palette

Publication

EP 1013563 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98122424 A

Priority

EP 98122424 A

Abstract (en)

Separating element in plastic material for stocking and transporting on a pallet of yarn spools wound on supports, comprising a plain base structure (2), provided on one side with means for engagement (12) with the support of each yarn spool, and with a flat supporting element (30), substantially circular, provided with a central opening in correspondence of the engaging means (12), suitable for providing a supporting base for the spool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013563 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): IT

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI