Global Patent Index - EP 1013567 A1

EP 1013567 A1 2000-06-28 - Rubbish bag

Title (en)

Rubbish bag

Title (de)

Müllbeutel

Title (fr)

Sac à ordures

Publication

EP 1013567 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98310654 A

Priority

EP 98310654 A

Abstract (en)

Nowadays it is commonplace to line rubbish bins with plastics bags before depositing rubbish in them. This not only keeps the bin clean but also allows the rubbish deposited in the bag to be removed and disposed of easily when the bin is full. Such a plastics bag (1) includes at or towards its open end a strip of elastic (4) connected to the bag (1) at two spaced apart portions (5). The elastic strip (4) extends between the spaced apart portions (5) extending over an extent of half the periphery or less of the bag (1) and is substantially relaxed when the open end (2) of the bag (4) is opened to its maximum extent. To use such a bag it is placed in a bin (6) and the open neck of the bag folded over the open end of the bin (6). The strip of elastic (4) is then pulled over and across the open end of the bin (6) to engage the folded over neck portion (7) on the opposite side of the bag (1). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/06; B65D 33/16; B65D 33/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 33/28 (2006.01); B65F 1/00 (2006.01); B65F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/06 (2013.01); B65D 33/165 (2013.01); B65D 33/28 (2013.01); B65F 1/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013567 A1 20000628; AU 2104800 A 20000731; WO 0039005 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020611

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI