Global Patent Index - EP 1013568 A1

EP 1013568 A1 2000-06-28 - Anti-assault device for containers

Title (en)

Anti-assault device for containers

Title (de)

Gegen Angriffe gesicherte Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif anti-attentat pour conteneurs

Publication

EP 1013568 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440370 A

Priority

FR 9816600 A

Abstract (en)

The waste bin has an exterior casing (1) and an internal container (2) which is sufficiently smaller to define a gap (3) between them. The inner container has a double base. The gap is filled with an incompressible material such as sand or non-hardening fluid.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif anti-attentat pour conteneur de type poubelle, constitué d'un ensemble placé à l'intérieur d'un conteneur existant, comportant une enceinte extérieure (1) et un panier intérieur (2), les dimensions du panier (2) étant inférieures à celle de l'enceinte (1) de telle sorte que l'un puisse être disposé à l'intérieure de l'autre en ménageant un espace (3) entre la paroi extérieure dudit panier et la paroi intérieure de ladite enceinte, ledit panier intérieur (2) comportant un double-fond (4). L'espace (3) est rempli d'un matériau incompressible, par exemple du sable ou tout fluide résistant au gel. Application : renforcement de tout conteneur réalisé dans un matériau non fragmentable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/08; B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/08 (2006.01); B65F 1/14 (2006.01); F42D 5/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2013.01); B65F 1/08 (2013.01); F42D 5/045 (2013.01); B65F 2210/13 (2013.01); B65F 2220/104 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013568 A1 20000628; FR 2787769 A1 20000630; FR 2787769 B1 20010209

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040430

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI