Global Patent Index - EP 1013581 A3

EP 1013581 A3 2000-07-12 - Process for statically and dynamically controlling tilting paper supply for high capacity feeder

Title (en)

Process for statically and dynamically controlling tilting paper supply for high capacity feeder

Title (de)

Verfahen zur statistischen und dynamischen Regelung der Neigung der Papierzufuhr für Hochgeschwindigkeits-Blattzuführvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour contrôler statistiquement et dynamiquement l'inclinaison d'alimentation du papier pour un dispositif d'alimentation à grande vitesse

Publication

EP 1013581 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125214 A

Priority

US 22097698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013581A2] A method of statically and dynamically controlling the height and angle of a feed tray (210) in an electrophotographic printing machine. The paper supply starts with the tray (210) lead edge ramped up 1.4 degrees and paper is loaded. Required paper properties are inputted or sensed automatically (e.g., gsm, size, etc.). The elevator raises to lowest possible stack height (to maintain stack control using tray guides in preparation for air system turning on). The initial tray angle is removed based on paper gsm and the air system activates fluffer and air knife jets (360), but vacuum is valved to off position. The stack height arm (352) is raised & lead edge attitude sensor (340) is interrogated for top sheet position relative to feed head acquisition surface (sensor may be position sensitive device type or multiple sensors with different focal lengths, etc.). Based on positions sensed by stack height and lead edge attitude sensors, the tray angle and/or stack height is adjusted until the desired sensor states are achieved. Upon completion of adjustments to the tray angle, stack height is verified. Feeding commences and stack height and lead edge attitude positions are checked each feed with corrections made accordingly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/00; B65H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2006.01); B65H 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/02 (2013.01); B65H 1/18 (2013.01); B65H 2511/152 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/21 (2013.01); B65H 2511/40 (2013.01); B65H 2511/514 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1311 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/152 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/21 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  3. B65H 2511/21 + B65H 2220/01
  4. B65H 2511/40 + B65H 2220/01
  5. B65H 2701/1311 + B65H 2220/01
  6. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 1146507 B 19630404 - MABEG MASCHB G M B H NACHF HEN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013581 A2 20000628; EP 1013581 A3 20000712; EP 1013581 B1 20030326; DE 69906231 D1 20030430; DE 69906231 T2 20030925; JP 2000191151 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151217

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151217

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906231

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-31 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20050809

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906231 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI