Global Patent Index - EP 1013582 A2

EP 1013582 A2 2000-06-28 - High capacity sheet feeder having tiltable tray

Title (en)

High capacity sheet feeder having tiltable tray

Title (de)

Hochgeschwindigkeits-Blaffzuführgerät mit kippbarem Zuführträger

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation de feuilles à grande vitesse avec plateau inclinable

Publication

EP 1013582 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125241 A

Priority

US 22097798 A

Abstract (en)

A tiltable tray (210) utilizing a multi-position stack height (contact) sensor (350) (can detect 2 or more specific stack heights) in conjunction with a second sensor (340) near stack lead edge which also senses distance to the top sheet (without sheet contact). The two sensors together enable the paper supply to position the stack (53) with respect to the acquisition surface both vertically and angularly in the process direction. This height and attitude control greatly improves the capability of the feeder (200) to cope with a wide range of paper basis weight, type, and curl. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/02; B65H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013582 A2 20000628; EP 1013582 A3 20000712; JP 2000191152 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI