Global patent index - EP 1013585 A1

EP 1013585 A1 2000-06-28 - Device for supplying web material

Title (en)

Device for supplying web material

Title (de)

Bandzuführvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation d'une bande

Publication

EP 1013585 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830783 A

Priority

EP 98830783 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a storage unit (5 to 8) and accommodates a reserve length of the web material (W) to be supplied. A first (17) and second (9) driving means make it possible to selectively control both the speed of the web material at the intake side (2) and the speed with which the stored reserve length of web material (W) is paid out, so that the speed at which the web material (W) is supplied at the output side (3) of the device can be kept constant independently of the fact that the supply of web material (W) to the intake side (2) is either slowed down or brought to a complete halt to permit, for example, the replacement of a roll from which the web material is supplied and/or to splice two lengths of the web material (W). The operation of the driving means (9, 17) is enslaved to a control signal generated by a sensor (19 to 23) that is preferably located at the output side (3) of the device and includes a return means (19) around which there passes a loop of the web material (W) that is being supplied. The control signal is generated as a function of the slackening and the shortening of the said loop in substantial absence of longitudinal tensile stresses applied to the web material (W). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/04; B65H 20/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/34 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/34 (2013.01); B65H 23/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013585 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI