Global Patent Index - EP 1013597 A1

EP 1013597 A1 2000-06-28 - Gearless driving device for lift

Title (en)

Gearless driving device for lift

Title (de)

Getriebelose Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Hebezeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif moteur sans réducteur pour élévateur

Publication

EP 1013597 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123848 A

Priority

EP 98123848 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a gearless drive device for an elevating device, notably an elevator. The device comprises a motor (6), a brake (4), a drive plate (2) and a casing (8) and is characterized in that the motor (6) and brake (4) are together housed in the casing (8). By means of a bearing sleeve (27) and bearings (34,5) the shaft is mounted in a self-supporting manner in a face-end opening (36) of the casing (8).

Abstract (de)

Eine getriebelose Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Hebezeug, insbesondere für einen Aufzug, mit einem Motor 6, einer Bremse 4 und einer Treibscheibe 2 sowie einem Gehäuse 8 zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß in dem Gehäuse 8 der Motor 6 und die Bremse 4 zusammen angeordnet sind. Die Welle ist mittels einer Lagerhülse 27 und Lagern 34, 35 in einer stirnseitigen Gehäuseöffnung 36 an dem Gehäuse 8 freitragend gelagert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0438 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013597 A1 20000628; AU 1980200 A 20000703; DE 19982684 D2 20010816; WO 0035799 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040701

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FISCHER, HUBERT

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI