Global Patent Index - EP 1013602 A1

EP 1013602 A1 2000-06-28 - Floor conveyor

Title (en)

Floor conveyor

Title (de)

Flurförderfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule chargeur-élévateur

Publication

EP 1013602 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124471 A

Priority

EP 98124471 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle has a hand-guided shaft (8) rotatable about a vertical axis for steering and pivotable about a horizontal axis from a lowered position (T) into a protruding high position (H). A drive motor is controlled via a controller with a drive switch on the shaft head. The drive controller can be changed over between a fast mode and a slow mode with a lower maximum speed using a speed switch on the shaft head. The slow mode maximum speed is reduced for the special operating mode compared to the normal mode.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Flurförderfahrzeug (1) mit handgeführter Deichsel (8) sind entsprechend der Neigungsstellung der um eine waagerechte und eine horizontale Achse schwenkbaren Deichsel (8) ein unterer Bremsbereich () und ein oberer Bremsbereich () mit einem zwischenliegenden Fahrbereich () unterschieden. An diesen grenzt ein innerhalb des oberen Bremsbereichs () gelegener Sonderfahrbereich () an, innerhalb dessen die für den Fahrbereich () geltende Höchstgeschwindigkeit (N) auf eine niedrigere Höchstgeschwindigkeit (n) herabgesetzt ist. Am Deichselkopf (17) sind außer dem Fahrschalter (18) für die Geschwindigkeitssteuerung ein Sonderfahrschalter (22), der zur Aktivierung des Sonderfahrbereichs () betätigt werden muß, und ein Geschwindigkeitsschalter (21) vorgesehen. Dieser ermöglicht ein Umschalten zwischen einer Schnellfahrt mit der Höchstgeschwindigkeit (N) und einer Langsamfahrt mit der niedrigeren Höchstgeschwindigkeit (L), wobei diese Höchstgeschwindigkeiten (N) und (L) im Fahrbereich () jeweils im Sonderfahrbereich () auf niedrigere Werte (n) und (l) herabgesetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/20; B66F 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01); B66F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2013.01); B66F 9/07568 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013602 A1 20000628; EP 1013602 B1 20020904; DE 59805448 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2013-04-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-04-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130321 AND 20130327

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130204

2013-02-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-02-20 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-02-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-02-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-11-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO.KG

2004-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO.KG

2004-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805448 20021010

2002-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *CROWN GABELSTAPLER G.M.B.H.MOOSACHERSTRASSE 52, D

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB LU NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI