Global Patent Index - EP 1013602 B1

EP 1013602 B1 2002-09-04 - Floor conveyor

Title (en)

Floor conveyor

Title (de)

Flurförderfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule chargeur-élévateur

Publication

EP 1013602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124471 A

Priority

EP 98124471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013602A1] The vehicle has a hand-guided shaft (8) rotatable about a vertical axis for steering and pivotable about a horizontal axis from a lowered position (T) into a protruding high position (H). A drive motor is controlled via a controller with a drive switch on the shaft head. The drive controller can be changed over between a fast mode and a slow mode with a lower maximum speed using a speed switch on the shaft head. The slow mode maximum speed is reduced for the special operating mode compared to the normal mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/20; B66F 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01); B66F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2013.01); B66F 9/07568 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013602 A1 20000628; EP 1013602 B1 20020904; DE 59805448 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2013-04-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-04-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130321 AND 20130327

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130204

2013-02-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-02-20 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-02-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-02-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805448

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-11-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO.KG

2004-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO.KG

2004-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805448 20021010

2002-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *CROWN GABELSTAPLER G.M.B.H.MOOSACHERSTRASSE 52, D

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB LU NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI