Global Patent Index - EP 1013747 A2

EP 1013747 A2 2000-06-28 - Agglomerate production

Title (en)

Agglomerate production

Title (de)

Herstellung von Agglomeraten

Title (fr)

Fabrication d'agglomérats

Publication

EP 1013747 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309100 A

Priority

  • GB 9825064 A
  • GB 9922690 A

Abstract (en)

A method of producing agglomerates, which method includes blending carbonaceous particles, and optionally organic waste material, with an additive comprising particulate clay, and with a binder comprising an aqueous emulsion of polyvinyl acetate. The resultant blend is then shaped to form agglomerates, and subsequently permitting the binder to cure in the agglomerates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343678 A 20000517; GB 2343678 B 20021211; GB 9927016 D0 20000112; EP 1013747 A2 20000628; EP 1013747 A3 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050305

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040825

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVANS, MEIRION THOMAS

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COOK, COLIN EDWARD

2003-06-04 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20021202

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030208

2003-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10L 5/14 A

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVANS, MEIRION THOMAS

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EVANS, MEIRION THOMAS,

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORGAN, JEFFREY DAVID,

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI