Global Patent Index - EP 1013790 A2

EP 1013790 A2 2000-06-28 - Method of making a heat treated spray formed superalloy article

Title (en)

Method of making a heat treated spray formed superalloy article

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von wärmebehandelten, sprühgegossesen Superlegierungsgegenstände

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication des objets en superalliage formés par projection et traités thermiquement

Publication

EP 1013790 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309128 A

Priority

US 21690498 A

Abstract (en)

Heat treated, spray formed articles are disclosed which exhibit crack growth rates and resistance to stress rupture comparable to corresponding, forged articles. The articles are first formed by depositing molten metal droplets, e.g., of a superalloy having a composition in weight percent of about 18-21 w/o Cr, 3.5-5 w/o Mo, 12-15 Co, 2.75-3.25 w/o Ti, 1.2-1.6 w/o Al, 0.01-0.08 w/o Zr, 0.003-0.010 w/o B, balance generally nickel, on a substrate to form a rough article. The articles are HIP'ed and then processed by heat treating, which includes solution, stabilization and precipitation heat treatments. The resultant articles have fine average grain sizes compared to forged and conventionally heat treated material, as well as yield and tensile strengths comparable to forged material. Importantly, the articles also exhibit low crack growth rates and stress rupture resistance, e.g., comparable to forged material, and have an isotropic microstructure. The articles can be used in place of forged articles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/12; C22C 19/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/08 (2006.01); C22C 19/05 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/30 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2013.01); C21D 9/50 (2013.01); C22C 19/055 (2013.01); C22C 19/056 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/30 (2013.01); C22F 1/10 (2013.01); C23C 4/08 (2013.01); C23C 4/123 (2016.01); C23C 4/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013790 A2 20000628; EP 1013790 A3 20000726; EP 1013790 B1 20040428; DE 69916763 D1 20040603; DE 69916763 T2 20050331; JP 2000192218 A 20000711; JP 3905674 B2 20070418; KR 100603882 B1 20060725; KR 20000047783 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131117

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916763

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131117

2014-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916763

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040808

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916763 P 20040603

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-11-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MAKING A HEAT TREATED SPRAY FORMED SUPERALLOY ARTICLE

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI