Global Patent Index - EP 1013791 A1

EP 1013791 A1 2000-06-28 - Plasma spraying installation

Title (en)

Plasma spraying installation

Title (de)

Anordnung für eine Plasmaspritzanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de projection à plasma

Publication

EP 1013791 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810973 A

Priority

CH 256898 A

Abstract (en)

A plasma spraying unit deflection system (5), comprising baffles (7, 8) within the spray chamber (1), is new. An Independent claim is also included for a plasma spraying unit provided with the above deflection system.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Anordnung für eine mit einer Behandlungskammer (1) und einem darin angeordneten Plasmaspritzgerät (2) versehene Plasmaspritzanlage vorgeschlagen. Um zu verhindern, dass in der Behandlungskammer (1) eine Gasströmung entsteht, welche Ablagerungen aufwirbelt, ist eine zumindest teilweise im Innenraum der Behandlungskammer (1) angeordnete Ablenkeinrichtung (5) vorgesehen. Vertikal unterhalb der Behandlungskammer (1) ist ein Sammelschacht (6) angeordnet. Im Übergangsbereich von der Behandlungskammer (1) zum Sammelschacht (6) ist ein mit Ablenkelementen (31) versehenes Grundelement (7) angeordnet, welches zumindest eine Durchlassöffnung (4) zwischen der Behandlungskammer (1) und dem Sammelschacht (6) freilässt. Im Sammelschacht (6) ist ein im wesentlichen kegelförmig ausgebildetes, in die Durchlassöffnung (4) des Grundelements (7) ragendes Ablenkelement (8) vorgesehen. Der Sammelschacht (6) steht zudem mit der Saugseite eines Gebläses (13) und einer Vakuumpumpe (12) in Verbindung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/137 (2016.01); C23C 4/134 (2016.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013791 A1 20000628; EP 1013791 B1 20050810; CA 2289870 A1 20000624; CA 2289870 C 20050705; CH 697092 A5 20080430; DE 59912388 D1 20050915; JP 2000239822 A 20000905; JP 4637309 B2 20110223; SG 85147 A1 20011219; US 6357386 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912388

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030107

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI